CA SB384 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9002 and 13125 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 290, 290.006, 290.008, 290.45, 290.46, 290.5, and 4852.03 of, the Penal Code, relating to sex offenders.
Title
Sex offenders: registration: criminal offender record information systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB384 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 384 Wiener Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB384 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 384 Wiener Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB384 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 541, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3015.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3488.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 112 suspended. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 3487.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 11). |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (July 5). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23059 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25634 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 290 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.006 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.008 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 290.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4852.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |