CA SB377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 369.5 and 739.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: psychotropic medications: medical information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB377 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - SB 377 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Mark Stone (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB377 McGuire (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 547, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2889.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3431.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-24AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-13AssemblyJune 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 1241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2019-04-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback