CA SB376 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25217.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: chair: report to the Legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB376 Bradford (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 644.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25217.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback