CA SB374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11320.1 of, and to add Sections 11323.21 and 11322.84 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11322.84 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11323.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |