CA SB374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10144.4 to the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.
Title
Health insurance: discriminatory practices: mental health.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB374 Newman Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 374 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB374 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 374 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB374 Newman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2019.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2474.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 798.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 559.) (March 29). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10144.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |