CA SB374 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20209.14 and 22161 of the Public Contract Code, relating to local public contracts.
Title
Local agency design-build projects: transit districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SB3 74 Hue so Con (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 374 Hueso Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB374 Hall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 374 Hueso Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB374 Hall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2763.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2787.) |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Set for hearing September 11. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3088.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8). |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 883.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20209.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |