CA SB373 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1788.19 to the Civil Code, relating to consumer debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer debt: economic abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateApril 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2021-04-02SenateApril 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2021-03-04SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2021-02-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1788.19New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback