CA SB372 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10723 of the Water Code, and to create the San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Groundwater Sustainability Agency, and prescribing its boundaries, organization, operation, management, financing, and other powers and duties, relating to water districts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
San Joaquin River Exchange Contractors Groundwater Sustainability Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB372 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 372 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB372 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 372 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By GRAY (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB372 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2905.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3164.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W.,P., & W. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 512.) (March 28). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10723 | Amended Code | Citation Text |