CA SB370 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy: solar storms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2017-09-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 24).
2017-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-17SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateApril 4 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-03-09SenateMarch 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25303Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code381.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback