CA SB365 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5506.13 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks.
Title
Regional park and open-space districts: County of Solano.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB365 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 365 Dodd Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Dodd et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 365 Dodd Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Dodd et al (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 216, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2171.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2581.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 538.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5506.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |