CA SB365 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15820.903 and 15820.913 of the Government Code, and to add Section 1978 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to jails.
Title
Jail construction: funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Dan Logue [R] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB365 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 365 Wolk Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 365 Wolk Senate Third Reading By YAMADA (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB365 Wolk (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 627, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2412.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 2452.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. P |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 3272.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3284.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(e) suspended. (Page 3188.) Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3189.) Read third time and amended. (Page 3190.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 605.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 484.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15820.903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15820.913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1978 | New Code | See Bill Text |