CA SB361 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42238.20 and 47612.7 of the Education Code, relating to school funding.
Title
School funding: minimum schoolday: Center for Advanced
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 361 Berryhill, T. Senate Third Reading By HALDERMAN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB361 Berryhill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB361 Berryhill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2693.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-07 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1237.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1115.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-05 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 429.) (March 23). | |
2011-03-09 | Set for hearing March 23. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42238.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47612.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |