CA SB360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10980 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public social services: prosecution for overpayment or overissuance of benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB360 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 360 Skinner Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB360 Skinner (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 390, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-05SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-13AssemblyJune 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-05-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-05-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-13SenateApril 17 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10980Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback