CA SB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13996.65 of, and to add Section 13996.43 to, the Government Code, relating to economic development, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
International trade and investment office: Mexico.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB357 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 357 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB357 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 357 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB357 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-15 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-15 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3216.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13996.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13996.65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |