CA SB356 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25402.10 of, and to add Section 25402.14 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 8380 of, and to add Section 769.6 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy data transparency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB356 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB356 Skinner (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (July 5). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 25). |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | May 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 806.) (April 24). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25402.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25402.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25402.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 323.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 769.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |