CA SB35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65400 and 65582.1 of, and to add and repeal Section 65913.4 of, the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: affordable housing: streamlined approval process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB35 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 35 Wiener Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Wiener et al (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3420.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3417.)
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28).
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 884.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 7.
2017-02-28SenateFebruary 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-02-24SenateSet for hearing February 28.
2017-02-23SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65582.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65589.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65913.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback