CA SB349 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1372 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: competence to stand trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB349 Roth (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | June 4 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-07-05 | Assembly | July 11 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1389.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1166.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 578.) (March 28). |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | March 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |