CA SB348 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21080.13 and 21080.14 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: railroad crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - SB 348 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB348 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB348 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2429.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 880.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |