CA SB345 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7120 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 7149.05 of, and to add Sections 7122 and 7233 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
The Sport Fishing Stimulus Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB345 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB345 Berryhill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1331.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 821.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 7120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7149.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7233 | New Code | See Bill Text |