CA SB343 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17580 and 17580.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 18015 and 42355.5 of, and to add Section 42355.51 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental advertising: recycling symbol: recyclability: products and packaging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB343 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 343 Allen Senate Third Reading By Lorena Gonzalez (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Allen et al (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-08AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 6).
2021-06-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2021-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1188.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-04-20SenateApril 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-08SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 6).
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 500.) (March 15).
2021-03-03SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
2021-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback