CA SB343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17138.4 and 24308.8 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Income taxes: gross income exclusions: Kast Property Tank Farm facility cleanup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB343 Bradford Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 343 Bradford Third Reading Urgency By GIPSON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Bradford Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 343 Bradford Third Reading Urgency By GIPSON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB343 Bradford Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6057.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6761.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2519.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing September 1. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | July 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Set for hearing July 17. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Set for hearing June 28. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17138.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24308.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24347.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |