CA SB340 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5276 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Lanterman-Petris-Short Act: hearings.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Health] and [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB340 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Health] and [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB340 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4). |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 21). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5276 | Amended Code | Citation Text |