CA SB339 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 10 in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 10 in 1021 O Street, Room 2100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4052.02 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1342.74 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.1933 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 14132.968 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to prescription drugs.
Title
HIV preexposure prophylaxis and postexposure prophylaxis.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and HEALTH. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4052.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1342.74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.1933 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |