CA SB333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15403 and 15404 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Trusts: modification or termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB333 Anderson et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - SB 333 Anderson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB333 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - SB 333 Anderson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB333 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1679.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2259.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 768.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 4). |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 15403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 15404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |