CA SB332 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11403.05 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration: foster youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - SB 332 Stern Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB332 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2580.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 25).
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11403.05New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback