CA SB331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1037.1 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidentiary privileges: domestic violence counselor-victim privilege.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Assembly - SB 331 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB331 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB331 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1148.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Published May 15 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 9). |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 430.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1037.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |