CA SB331 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 274, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 274, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54440, 54441.5, 54442, 54443.1, 54444.1, and 54444.2 of the Education Code, relating to migrant education.
Title
Migrant education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB331 Romero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 331 Romero Senate Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB331 Romero (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Assembly - SB 331 Romero Senate Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB331 Romero (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 274, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4919.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-20 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6363.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committe August 12.) | |
2010-08-05 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-06-23 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 16.) | |
2010-06-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-07-09 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on ED. | |
2009-06-01 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1104.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 1070.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 608.) | |
2009-04-16 | Set for hearing April 22. | |
2009-04-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-14 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |