CA SB328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gloria.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 46148 to the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil attendance: school start time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 328 Portantino Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 26 N: 30 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Portantino et al (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14AssemblyMotion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gloria.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 30. Page 3430.)
2017-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1268.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1182.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 782.) (April 19).
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-07SenateMarch 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code46148New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback