CA SB328 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1240.055 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to eminent domain.
Title
Eminent Domain Law: conservation easement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB328 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 328 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Kehoe (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 328 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Kehoe (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2148.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 2576.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-09 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-27 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1137.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1240.055 | New Code | See Bill Text |