CA SB327 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 886, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 886, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.26 (commencing with Section 1798.91.04) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to information privacy.
Title
Information privacy: connected devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB327 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 327 Jackson Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB327 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 327 Jackson Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB327 Jackson (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 886, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5925.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6715.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 3). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4068.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Jackson. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Published May 17 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1020.) (May 9). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.91.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.91.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |