CA SB326 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76000.10 of the Government Code, and to add Section 10752 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Courts: penalties: emergency services funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB326 Beall Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 326 Beall Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Beall (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 326 Beall Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Beall (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3097.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | July 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1301.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 20 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 545.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 76000.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10752 | New Code | See Bill Text |