CA SB322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1278.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: inspections: employee reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 322 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB322 Bradford (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB322 Bradford (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 72, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 819.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1278.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |