CA SB322 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 47605 of the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter schools: pupils: suspension and expulsion: admissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 322 Leno Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB322 Leno (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB322 Leno (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 34. Page 6492.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member O'Donnell. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1151.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 722.) (April 22). |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 47605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49068.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |