CA SB321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6305.1 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment safety standards: advisory committee: household domestic services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB321 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading Amend By CHIU Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB321 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Assembly - SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Chiu (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading Amend By CHIU Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB321 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 2885.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2559.) |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1311.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 775.) (April 13). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6305.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |