CA SB320 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 99250) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public university student health centers: medication abortion readiness: abortion by medication techniques: College Student Health Center Sexual and Reproductive Health Preparation Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB320 Leyva (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-06-04AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-13SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4019.) (January 10).
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2017-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 807.) (April 19).
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-23SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
2017-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code99250New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code137Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback