CA SB320 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49013 of the Education Code, relating to pupil fees.
Title
Pupil fees: complaint of noncompliance: appeal procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB320 Lara Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 320 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB320 Lara (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 320 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB320 Lara (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2015-10-09 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2015-10-09 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2664.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2952.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1151.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 722.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |