CA SB320 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 10968, 10969, and 10970 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB320 Wright (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB320 Wright (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 6.) | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 12.) | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1226.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1115.) (May 26). | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-03-16 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10968 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10968.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10969 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10971 | New Code | See Bill Text |