CA SB32 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 3.5 (commencing with Section 28960) to Title 4 of, and to repeal Section 28968 of, the Corporations Code, and to add and repeal Sections 12211, 17053.50, and 23650 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to business investment.
Title
Business investment: tax credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 28960 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 28968 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 66024.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12211 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23650 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |