CA SB32 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23016 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: definitions: rectifiers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Assembly - SB 32 Leno Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB32 Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB32 Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB32 Leno Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB32 Leno (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 301, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-25 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-08-25 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1218.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-26 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-04-28 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-28 | Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-04-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 655.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-13 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 414.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-15 | Set for hearing March 22. | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |