CA SB32 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 399.20 of, and to add Section 387.6 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Renewable electric generation facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 32 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By FUENTES (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB32 Negrete McLeod (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB32 Negrete McLeod (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB32 Negrete McLeod (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB32 Negrete McLeod (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2419.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-11 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3333.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-10 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Placed on third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3038.) Re-referred to Com. On U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on July 6.) | |
2009-07-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-15 | To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1184.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 583.) | |
2009-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-01-29 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2008-12-03 | From print. May be acted upon on or after January 2. | |
2008-12-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |