CA SB315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4602 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
California Massage Therapy Council: material for non-English speakers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SB 315 Nguyen Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB315 Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB315 Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Published April 26 at 4 a.m. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | April 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |