CA SB313 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.9 (commencing with Section 11549.80) to Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Department of Technology: Office of Artificial Intelligence: state agency public interface: use of AI.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 656.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11549.80 | New Code | See Bill Text |