CA SB313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 2207) to Chapter 2 of Division 3 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to animals.
Title
Animals: prohibition on use in circuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB313 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 313 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB313 Hueso (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 313 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB313 Hueso (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 768, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2835.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 3191.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 18). |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 798.) (April 23). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2207 | New Code | See Bill Text |