CA SB312 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 781 and 786 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: sealing of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB312 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Motion to Reconsider By BOCANEGRA (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB312 Skinner (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Motion to Reconsider By BOCANEGRA (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 312 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB312 Skinner (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3215.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 3214.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bocanegra. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3173.) |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 19). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Published May 26 at 2 p.m. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 855.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 781 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |