CA SB311 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1415, 9255, and 9260 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 34457 and 34458 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Local elections: charters and charter proposals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB311 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 311 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - Assembly - SB 311 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB311 Padilla (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 2477.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 809.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 566.) (April 17). |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 1415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34457 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34458 | Amended Code | Citation Text |