CA SB310 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 856, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1279.5 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to name and gender changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Name and gender change: prisons and county jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB310 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - SB 310 Atkins Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB310 Atkins et al (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 856, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2885.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1321.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 514.) (March 28).
2017-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2017-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1279.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback