CA SB302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 99.02 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to joint powers.
Title
Joint powers agencies: Orange County Fire Authority: funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB302 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 302 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB302 Mendoza (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 302 Mendoza Senate Third Reading By DALY (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB302 Mendoza (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 807, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 3172.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1145.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1019.) (May 10). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 10. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | May 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6503.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6503.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 99.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |