CA SB301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Set for hearing January 18.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 11:30 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 1.4D (commencing with Section 1749.8) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketplaces: online marketplaces.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2022-01-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 12).
2022-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-12-28SenateSet for hearing January 12.
2021-03-26SenateApril 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 6.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1749.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback