CA SB301 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to fisheries.
Title
Salmon fisheries.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-12-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-03-09 | To Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ. | |
2009-02-26 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |