CA SB300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Kalra.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Kalra.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 190.2 of, and to repeal Section 1385.1 of, the Penal Code, relating to crimes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Crimes: murder: punishment.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] |
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Cortese et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Cortese et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Kalra. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1980.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Cortese. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1385.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 190.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |